KING'S ROYAL HUSSARS REGIMENTAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the efficiency of Her Majesty's Army and in particular the Regiment and of any unit of the Regiment or the Regimental Association of the Regiment in such a manner as Trustees shall from time to time determine. The provision of financial assistance for former and serving members of the Regiment or former Regiments, or the dependents thereof who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.37k | £147.67k | £132.26k | £128.81k | £116.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.69k | £93.91k | £109.76k | £134.93k | £113.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.25k | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRSUT DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMY AND IN PARTICULAR THE REGIMENT AND OF ANY UNIT OF THE REGIMENT OR THE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION OF THE REGIMENT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS AND FORMER SERVING MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE DEPENDANTS THEREOF WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS C) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HHQ KRH
Peninsula Barracks
Romsey Road
WINCHESTER
SO23 8TP
- Phone:
- 01962828520
- Email:
- hhq@krh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window