Financial history SUNNYSIDE COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1021458
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £79.08k £67.04k £66.10k £65.38k £68.93k
Total expenditure £69.50k £69.00k £71.89k £63.19k £66.33k
Income from government contracts £65.30k N/A £50.94k £56.09k £58.61k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A