SUTTON-IN-CRAVEN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021475
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Meetings,Lectures Outings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008

Total income: £1,990
Total expenditure: £1,946

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1993: Standard registration
  • 20 February 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £1.92k £830 £1.79k £1.99k £1.99k
Total expenditure £1.74k £816 £1.69k £1.95k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 19 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 12 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 13 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 07 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required