WEST BUCKLAND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BULB ORDERS LEAGUE AND FRIENDLY SKITTLES HANDBELL RINGING CHOIR CRAFT CLASS GOLF CROQUET BOOK CLUB WALKING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 May 1993: Standard registration
- WBWI (Working name)
- WEST BUCKLAND WI (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Wombwell | Chair | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bubb | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian McGoun | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Enid Margaret Halliwell | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Featherstone | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl M Bailey | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE SUSAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.43k | £1.50k | £521 | £3.02k | £3.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £1.40k | £1.06k | £2.13k | £3.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST BUCKLAND AND WELLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherwood
West Buckland
WELLINGTON
TA21 9JS
- Phone:
- 01823664361
- Email:
- sueporcas@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window