WEST LONDON TAMIL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUNNING A TAMIL SCHOOL ON EVERY SATURDAY TO PROVIDE LEARNING FACILITIES IN TAMIL LANGUAGE, SOUTH INDIAN MUSIC, DANCE, MIRUTHANGAM, FLUTE AND CULTURAL VALUES. THIS IS PROVIDED TO CHILDREN WHO ARE SEEKING SUCH FACILITIES. WE ARE ALSO CONDUCTING TAMIL AND FINE ARTS EXAMINATIONS IN UK AND EUROPE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 May 1993: Standard registration
- WLTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivakaran Thavamoorthy ASecretary | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Srivijaya Sitampalam | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Selvanathan Thambithurai | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thiya Prasanna P Covernor | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMIRTHALINGAM NAGARAJAH | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUBRAMANIAM CHETTIAR KUGASENAN CHETTIAR | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NANTHAKUMARAN NAGARATNAM | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR POOTHATHAMBY RASIAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.80k | £19.86k | £40.88k | £56.52k | £69.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.45k | £17.71k | £31.38k | £49.53k | £57.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2014 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2014
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN WEST LONDON BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A SCHOOL TO PROVIDE IN PARTICULAR INSTRUCTION IN THE TAMIL LANGUAGE THE FINE ARTS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY. II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE OF TAMIL SPEAKING PEOPLE. III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF REFUGEES IN PARTICULAR TAMIL SPEAKING PEOPLE. IV) THE PROVISION OF THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND IN SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. V) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE WHO NEED THEM BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. VI) THE PROVISION OF SUCH OTHER SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS ARE NECESSARY TO ADVANCE THE ABOVE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Hill Rise
Greenford
UB6 8PE
- Phone:
- 07545839574
- Email:
- AMIR_NAGARAJAH@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
wlts-ofaal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window