BARBY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop women's interests in arts, crafts, music, drama and the sciences and to give them the opportunity of working together to put into practice the ideals of fellowship, truth, tolerance and justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 25 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY ELIZABETH EVANS | Chair |
|
||||||
Susan Richardson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
JANET MIDDLETON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Grange | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sloper | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Honorary Treasurer, Mrs Caroline Bradnam | Trustee | 05 November 1990 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JEAN MARIGOLD UPTON-BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOYCE SEAGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £1.21k | £207 | £2.29k | £2.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £846 | £746 | £2.19k | £1.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BARBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMBERLEY
BRACKENDALE DRIVE
BARBY
RUGBY
WARWICKSHIRE
CV23 8TJ
- Phone:
- 01788890768
- Website:
-
rogeruptonbrown@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window