Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF CHELTENHAM NORTH TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1021635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.36k £14.62k £74.23k £42.81k £37.46k
Total expenditure £4.48k £15.76k £53.68k £42.14k £40.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.50k £1.50k N/A