Financial history POULTON PRE-SCHOOL AND TODDLER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021675
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £77.96k £86.68k £66.17k £85.69k £90.14k
Total expenditure £75.21k £70.14k £82.61k £88.33k £112.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £43.43k £45.18k £60.57k
Income from government grants N/A £63.62k N/A N/A N/A