Trustees COTTINGHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1021679

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Hoggarth | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hewson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadian Grayson | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lazenby | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Keith | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Kemp | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HARPER | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Liz Bird | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Longbone | Trustee | 05 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN YOUNGER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.