NESS AND LITTLE NESTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One monthly social meeting for women members. This usually comprises a talk by a speaker and institute news/business, with refreshments. There are occasional extra activities - trips and meals out, and we also have a reading group which meets monthly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 02 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann Bordley | Chair | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lowe | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Arrowsmith | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Potter | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Davis | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Thornthwaite | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Roochove | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Buckley | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elaine Garside | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £1.26k | £5.63k | £7.03k | £4.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.34k | £1.54k | £4.94k | £6.94k | £5.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Thirlmere Road
NESTON
CH64 9SB
- Phone:
- 01513453938
- Email:
- cfwi@wi-cheshire.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window