Accounts and annual returns POPPETS PLAYGROUP PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021761
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 06 December 2012 01 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2012 01 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 11 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 11 June 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 13 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 18 March 2011 On Time