Financial history POPPETS PLAYGROUP PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021761
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 06/12/2012
Total gross income £83.06k £83.23k £125.75k £145.85k £105.50k
Total expenditure £70.20k £88.09k £107.46k £126.76k £108.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A