Accounts and annual returns THE PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF HILLSIDE SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1021785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 March 2025 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 May 2024 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 March 2023 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2023 636 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required