Financial history HALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.42k £6.83k £8.50k £14.29k £2.79k
Total expenditure £9.89k £5.36k £8.90k £14.86k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £256 N/A N/A N/A N/A