BURTON JOYCE AND BULCOTE EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021824
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008

Total income: £2,482
Total expenditure: £2,602

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 1993: Standard registration
  • 11 May 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £2.39k £2.93k £1.75k £3.32k £2.48k
Total expenditure £2.13k £3.13k £3.16k £2.89k £2.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 08 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required