ANGELMAN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support families, individuals and professionals who are affected by or who come into contact with Angelman Syndrome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 May 1993: Standard registration
- A S S E R T (Working name)
- ASSERT (Working name)
- ANGELMAN SYNDROME SUPPORT EDUCATION AND RESEARCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL MARTIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Alan Mountford-Brown | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandria Edgar | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Warne | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Gemma Munsey | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Dan Moir | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIan Allen | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Fox-Jones | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LISA JAYNE COURT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.95k | £71.78k | £78.98k | £113.56k | £124.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.63k | £30.92k | £26.20k | £151.21k | £60.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 JANUARY 1993, AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF THOSE WITH ANGELMAN SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ANGELMAN SYNDROME (3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ANGELMAN SYNDROME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
AngelmanUK
PO BOX 4962
NUNEATON
CV11 9FD
- Phone:
- 0300 999 0102
- Email:
- support@angelmanuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window