KINOULTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL RURAL WOMEN'S COMMUNITY AND OTHERS. IT IS FOR THE FURTHERENCE OF SKILLS AND EDUCATION ALLOWING LOCAL WOMEN TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE IN OUR COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE CLARKE | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH BAILEY PRESIDENT | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SWIFT SECRETARY | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PENNY SPICE | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jan Hortor | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE DREW ASS PRES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.30k | £843 | £1.18k | £1.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £1.12k | £998 | £1.50k | £1.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hecadeck Cottage 2A Church End
Nether Broughton
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 3ET
- Phone:
- 07816 295897
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window