Accounts and annual returns BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL FLITWICK

Charity Number: 1021946
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 July 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 July 2022 21 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 July 2022 386 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 July 2022 386 days late
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time