Accounts and annual returns QUEEN CAMEL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1021953
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 21 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 21 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 04 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 04 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 11 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 11 June 2014 On Time