Financial history QUEEN CAMEL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1021953
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £33.87k £55.00k £36.78k £69.25k £92.75k
Total expenditure £36.60k £44.83k £39.59k £58.37k £78.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0