Financial history HALSTEAD NURSERY

Charity number: 1022015
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £108.77k £112.48k £96.70k £94.95k £110.49k
Total expenditure £78.17k £104.66k £97.43k £103.80k £288.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.05k £78.61k £61.37k £58.09k £81.77k