FRIENDS PARENTS AND ASSOCIATES OF GLANAETHWY DRAMA SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1022078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity collects money for Ysgol Glanaethwy drama school. The money is used for hiring buses to events and other costs ircurred during performances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 12 September 2023

Total income: £3,795
Total expenditure: £6,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CYMDEITHAS CYFEILLION A RHIENI YSGOL GLANAETHWY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN JONES Trustee
THE ROYAL WELSH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
LOWRI HUGHES Trustee
None on record
RHIAN ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/09/2019 12/09/2020 12/09/2021 12/09/2022 12/09/2023
Total gross income £12.58k £8.52k £290 £1.49k £3.80k
Total expenditure £21.62k £10.95k £3.04k £8.03k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 September 2023 11 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 12 September 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 12 September 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 12 September 2020 18 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 12 September 2019 19 July 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PLAS TIRION
PENTIR
BANGOR
LL57 2BL
Phone:
01248352202