FAZAKERLEY SPECIAL NEEDS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide social/recreational activities for people with learning and physical disabilities. services include: adult drama group, adult social group a childrens group for 8-19 year olds on Saturdays, Youths Sports group. We facilitate playschemes during school holidays and community support for inclusion in all aspects of economic and social developments within the area by active networking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 03 June 1993: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 November 2011: Re-registered
- 24 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FSNP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.24k | £76.31k | £83.42k | £68.74k | £77.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.90k | £76.97k | £84.80k | £86.31k | £87.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 14 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE; SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, LEISURE AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND DISABILITIES.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window