CARING AND SHARING ASSOCIATION EAST SUSSEX

Charity Number: 1022122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support the disadvantaged in certain developing countries as detailed in our report and accounts. We cannot reply to unsolicited requests for help.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £42,908
Total expenditure: £42,362

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Brazil
  • Colombia
  • Ethiopia
  • Ghana
  • Honduras
  • India
  • Peru
  • Romania
  • Rwanda
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BISHOP OF LEWES CARING AND SHARING EAST SUSSEX (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen White Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
CHRIS JAMES Trustee 01 February 2019
None on record
Holly Stevenson Trustee 03 July 2017
None on record
Michael Jones Trustee 14 October 2016
None on record
Julia Maling Trustee 10 January 2014
None on record
CHRISTINE READE Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
REV HUGH MARTIN MOSELEY BA Trustee
None on record
JULIET MARY LYON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £64.67k £55.02k £60.92k £46.29k £42.91k
Total expenditure £67.90k £39.70k £69.94k £49.59k £42.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 19 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 19 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 19 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 19 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 20 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 6
The Normans
Normandale
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3NU
Phone:
07864 988444