DUNSTABLE WI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 04 June 1993: Standard registration
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 November 2016: Re-registered
- DOWNSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (BEDFORDSHIRE) (Previous name)
- DUNSTABLE DOWNSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- DUNSTAPLE DOWNSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA MAY FISHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH PATRICIA SHRIMPTON | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE OWEN | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE COX | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY STEVENS | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RITA ROSEMARIE LELOCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS RITA TOMKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY SYLVIA EVERETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN READ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £4.73k | £4.55k | £1.21k | £684 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.75k | £3.72k | £4.67k | £700 | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2022 | 562 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DUNSTABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 NORCOTT CLOSE
DUNSTABLE
LU5 4AH
- Phone:
- 01582665895
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window