AVON COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities organised by this charity are consistent with upholding the objects of the Women's Institute charity of which the main purpose is to enable women who are associated with rural life, including arts, crafts and sciences, to improve and develop conditions of rural life, to advance their education in citizenship, in public questions both national and international, in music, drama and o
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 June 1993: Standard registration
- AVON FEDERATION OF WIS (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorna Mary Tarr | Chair | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Millar | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Rurh Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josie Pownall | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Massey | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Francis Berryman | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Ellen Hulance | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY MURPHY | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.18k | £52.82k | £55.88k | £109.11k | £89.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.81k | £66.22k | £66.60k | £116.08k | £89.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION (ALREADY LODGED) AS AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
“THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN AVON AND ELSEWHERE.”
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WI HOUSE
11 STATION ROAD
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 2BH
- Phone:
- 01179864782
- Email:
- finance@avonfwi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window