Accounts and annual returns DRUMMOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1022297
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 March 2008 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 March 2007 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 March 2007 42 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 08 December 2005 On Time