Financial history ONE WORLD ACTION

Charity number: 1022298
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £2.30m £2.21m £2.90m £2.91m £2.59m
Total expenditure £2.12m £2.03m £2.77m £2.88m £2.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.27m £245.29k £2.87m £2.91m £2.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.92m £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.86k £44.38k £31.76k £88 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.13k £213 £5.40k £8.84k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.95m £1.89m £2.64m £2.73m £2.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £19.56k £15.61k £16.03k £16.39k £25.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.22m £1.11m £1.74m £1.88m £1.78m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0