CENTRO SOCIAL DE MAYORES (SOCIAL CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To serve as a centre point for elderly Spanish citizens in the United Kingdom & contribute to their welfare by offering services of social & cultural character through the following activities: Exercise, language & Literacy, Art & Crafts, Computer Skills classes. Daily activities to encourage social interaction: playing card games, dominoes, etc and the offer of general help and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 June 1993: Standard registration
- SPANISH PENSIONERS CLUB IN LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PILAR LOPEZ CASTRO | Trustee | 17 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSE BENEDICTO SACHOCOS RIOBO | Trustee | 09 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOSE DE LA CASA SOTILLO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.49k | £17.28k | £10.91k | £34.33k | £34.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.93k | £15.27k | £25.15k | £40.23k | £40.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE PARTICULARLY THOSE OF SPANISH NATIONALITY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LONDON AREA.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
317A Portobello Road
North Kensington
W10 5SY
- Phone:
- 02089691109
- Email:
- info@csmayores.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window