MUDIAD MEITHRIN

Charity number: 1022320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mudiad Ysgolion Meithrin aims to give every pre-school child in Wales the opportunity to benefit from early years experiences through the medium of Welsh.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 1993: Standard registration
  • 04 June 2015: Funds received from 509336 CYLCH MEITHRIN CYMRAEG RADUR/PENTREPOETH/RADYR AND...
  • 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1062861 YSGOL FEITHRIN ABERPORTH
  • 23 February 2021: Funds received from 1059522 CYLCH MEITHRIN TABERNACL (PENYBONT AR QGWR)
  • 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1054814 CYLCH MEITHRIN BRYNSIENCYN
  • 11 July 2023: Funds received from 1188306 CYLCH MEITHRIN ABERSOCH
  • 18 December 2023: Funds received from 1058677 CYLCH MEITHRIN PORTHAETHWY
  • 14 October 2024: Funds received from 518495 ST DONATS NURSERY SCHOOL
  • 14 January 2025: Funds received from 1192728 CYLCH MEITHRIN CAERLLION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN (Previous name)
  • MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN (Previous name)
  • MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN MODEL CONSTITUTION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Catrin Edwards Chair 01 June 2021
None on record
Noam Mabon Megira Devey Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Helen Roddick Trustee 01 October 2022
CYLCH MEITHRIN Y BONT FAEN
Received: On time
Owen Glyn Derbyshire Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Gwennan Schiavone Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Dr Geraldine Lublin Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Savanna Jones Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Elin Maher Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Gwenno George Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Huw Marshall Trustee 01 June 2020
Tanio Ltd.
Received: On time
COMMUNITY FURNITURE AID
Received: On time
CYLCH MEITHRIN BLAENGARW
Received: 28 days late
Corinna Lloyd-Jones Trustee 21 October 2016
None on record
Huw Williams Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Alison Rees-Edwards Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Dr Rhodri Llwyd Morgan Trustee 11 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.97m £6.90m £7.63m £8.71m £8.79m
Total expenditure £6.96m £6.85m £7.53m £8.49m £8.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.86m £4.92m £5.59m £6.52m £6.54m
Income - Donations and legacies £92.00k £81.00k £17.00k £7.00k £55.00k
Income - Other trading activities £2.02m £1.89m £2.01m £2.11m £2.13m
Income - Charitable activities £4.86m £4.92m £5.59m £6.52m £6.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £2.00k £1.00k £2.00k £10.00k
Income - Other £5.00k £0 £4.00k £60.00k £54.00k
Income - Legacies £92.00k £81.00k £0 £0 £37.81k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.77m £6.77m £7.32m £8.24m £8.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £188.00k £82.00k £208.00k £252.00k £215.00k
Expenditure - Governance £77.00k £62.00k £114.00k £92.00k £101.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £216.00k £258.00k £128.00k £251.00k £110.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.46m £2.34m £2.33m £2.25m £1.59m
Long-term investments £626.00k £765.00k £806.00k £772.00k £845.00k
Other assets £1.87m £1.93m £2.14m £2.86m £3.32m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.10m £1.00m £1.10m £1.52m £1.27m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MUDIAD MEITHRIN
BOULEVARD ST. BRIUEC
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 1PD
Phone:
01970639639