ALL SAINTS (ST PAUL'S WALDEN) PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance and upkeep of the fabric and churchyard of All Saints church, St. Paul's Walden and any other charitable activities connected with the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Love | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev STEPHEN LISTER FIELDING | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Donna Louise Muir | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Martin Mann | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gordon Johnstone | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Orla White | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Liddell | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ROWLAND | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER REGINALD WELCH ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £0 | £19.47k | £66.41k | £21.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £1.70k | £2.45k | £4.95k | £100.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR: 1 THE RESTORATION, REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, ST PAUL'S WALDEN, HERTFORDSHIRE 2 THE PROVISION, RESTORATION AND REPAIR OF MONUMENTS, ORNAMENTS, FURNISHINGS, WINDOWS AND OTHER EMBELLISHMENTS AND EQUIPMENT OF THE CHURCH 3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
ST PAUL'S WALDEN, HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 High Street
Whitwell
Hitchin
SG4 8AG
- Phone:
- 01438871889
- Email:
- charlotteanddanny@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window