STEPPING STONES PLAYGROUP (WELLS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre school playgroup
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £59,879 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 June 1993: Standard registration
- ST THOMAS PLAYGROUP WELLS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Logan | Chair | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Phillips | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Teakle | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Green | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Andersson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Walmsley | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Candice Blackman | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Barkle | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carly Thompson | Trustee | 18 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.57k | £82.24k | £68.31k | £69.40k | £78.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.44k | £75.02k | £77.27k | £66.58k | £70.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.11k | £69.39k | £59.35k | £58.42k | £59.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 September 2023 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 September 2023 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 September 2023 | 433 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stepping Stones Playgroup
Stoberry Park School
North Road
Wells
Somerset
BA5 2TJ
- Phone:
- 01749677011
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window