HMS COLLINGWOOD VOLUNTEER CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CORPS IS TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN, BETWEEN THE AGES OF 9 AND 18, TO DEVELOP THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IMPROVED BY EMPLOYING THE TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE ROYAL NAVY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CPO VCC Christopher Potter | Chair | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CPO RNVCC Andrew Sansom | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.04k | £18.67k | £15.00k | £15.00k | £895 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.40k | £21.34k | £11.00k | £3.00k | £1.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.52k | £3.03k | £3.03k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN BETWEN THE AGES OF 9 AND 16 YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS ADULTS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED EMPLOYING THE TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES OF THE ROYAL NAVY TO ACHIEVE THIS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
H M S COLLINGWOOD
NEWGATE LANE
FAREHAM
PO14 1AS
- Phone:
- 01329332344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window