STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL (HARDLEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £62,691 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southampton City
Governance
- 08 June 1993: Standard registration
- COLORS PRESCHOOL (Previous name)
- ST BERNARD'S PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Graves | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Graves | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Green | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.77k | £99.26k | £97.50k | £86.23k | £80.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.87k | £100.36k | £102.94k | £99.27k | £84.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £92.19k | £83.56k | £72.90k | £77.19k | £62.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/09/1990 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TEACHERS WAY
HARDLEY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 2QG
- Phone:
- 02380897025
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window