Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NEWLANDS (PTA FOR NEWLANDS PRY SCHOOL)

Charity number: 1022397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2020 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 Not Required