Financial history COME AND PLAY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £58.40k £68.76k £74.21k £63.27k £57.39k
Total expenditure £60.27k £65.43k £73.77k £65.84k £61.58k
Income from government contracts £43.78k £53.81k N/A £43.17k £44.78k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A