Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL COALITION BUILDING INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1022421
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 06 September 2004 On Time