PEACHCROFT PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE-SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN AGED 2 1/2 YEARS - 5 YEARS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 June 1993: Standard registration
- 22 June 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1163995 PEACHCROFT PRE-SCHOOL
- PEACHCROFT PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.84k | £102.24k | £100.88k | £111.44k | £117.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.66k | £110.27k | £100.75k | £84.02k | £100.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 29 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 07 March 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 29 March 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PPROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window