Accounts and annual returns FAWLEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1022448
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 August 2017 42 days late
Annual return 31 August 2015 18 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 01 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 01 May 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 25 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 25 October 2013 On Time