BLEWBURY SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blewbury School P.T.A organises events specifically to raise money for the children of Blewbury Primary School. These includes events such as a Christmas and Summer Fair, quiz nights, discos, cake sales and car boots sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Cantwell | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Smith | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Barrett | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chantler | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Vickers | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Victoria Lomas | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £6.14k | £3.11k | £5.84k | £10.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.29k | £6.17k | £2.86k | £7.53k | £3.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mandalay
Westbrook Street
Blewbury
DIDCOT
Oxfordshire
OX11 9QB
- Phone:
- 07865058091
- Email:
- Millieprice09@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window