Financial history HIND LEYS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £383.00k £440.50k £473.60k £605.32k £673.07k
Total expenditure £390.00k £443.72k £477.38k £533.94k £638.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £6.94k £6.26k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £598.35k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £28 £69
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £666.74k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £6.26k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £533.94k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.67k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.71k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £633.09k