Financial history BARNETBY UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1022513
Charity reporting is up to date (121 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £83.96k £97.43k £87.41k £79.09k £88.07k
Total expenditure £66.61k £84.93k £105.19k £77.64k £86.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.33k £10.52k N/A N/A