Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF SEABURN BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1022518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.71k £5.62k £9.20k £9.20k £8.44k
Total expenditure £9.85k £5.18k £8.15k £8.15k £7.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A