FYLDE COAST WOMEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FCWA support victims of domestic abuse across Blackpool, Wyre and Fylde. Our mission is to empower service users "To live their lives free from abuse". FCWA offer an holistic 24 hour response service with three main areas of provision; IDVA, (Independent Domestic Violence Advisor), Outreach and recovery Safe temporary accommodation (refuge) Children Services (Safehaven)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,241,398
Donations and legacies | £25.45k | |
Charitable activities | £1.19m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.76k | |
Other | £4.72k |
Total expenditure:
£1,081,683
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £587,674 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.08m | |
Retained for future use | £159.72k |
People

38 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 June 1993: Standard registration
- FYLDE COAST WOMENS REFUGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA Dewhurst | Chair | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE CROUCH | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lawler | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEANA WHALLEY | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARY HOLDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £789.00k | £1.13m | £1.02m | £1.31m | £1.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £711.03k | £846.54k | £936.96k | £978.14k | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.35k | £119.12k | £182.34k | £226.27k | £587.67k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £18.79k | £43.45k | £16.47k | £48.40k | £25.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £753.98k | £1.06m | £1.00m | £1.26m | £1.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.29k | £450 | £84 | £4.60k | £17.76k | |
|
Income - Other | £14.95k | £17.42k | £2.93k | £3.14k | £4.72k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £711.03k | £846.54k | £936.96k | £978.14k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.43k | £11.51k | £16.65k | £17.22k | £18.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £835.04k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £36.03k | £192.50k | £229.96k | £243.88k | £236.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £667.53k | £807.85k | £1.00m | £1.20m | £1.36m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.01k | £35.30k | £181.29k | £61.05k | £53.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 May 2022 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/06/2013
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF WOMAN IN BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE AND ADJACENT AREAS. 2.TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN GRAVELY OR PERSISTENTLY MALTREATED OR ABUSED AND ANY CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN BY ESTABLISHMENT OF A REFUGE TO PROVIDE SHELTER AND A SAFE ENVIRONMENT FOR SUCH WOMEN AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THEIR CHILDREN. 3.TO RELIEVE WOMEN FROM THE EFFECTS OF SUCH VIOLENCE BY PROVIDING AND DEVELOPING A SUPPORT NETWORK OF PEOPLE COMMITTED TO RELIEVING THE SAID DISTRESS EXPERIENCED BY WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN OR ARE BEING SUBJECT TO MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ABUSE. 4.TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH WOMEN.
Area of benefit
BLACKPOOL WYRE AND FYLDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fylde Coast Womens Aid
77 Montague Street
BLACKPOOL
FY4 1AT
- Phone:
- 01253752014
- Email:
- info@fcwa.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window