URC THAMES NORTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of religion through and of the charitable work of, the United Reformed Church, with particular responsibility for the Thames North Synod of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
- 23 March 2012: Funds received from 250254 THE HERTFORDSHIRE CONGREGATIONAL UNION (INCORPORAT...
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 234791-1 WORKING FUNDS
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 234791 REGENT SQUARE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
- 28 March 2025: Funds received from 276876 NEW COURT CHURCH TRUST
- THAMES NORTH TRUST (Working name)
- TNT (Working name)
- URC TNT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Yates | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN MARGARET WYBER | Trustee | 21 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
IAN CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 11 March 2006 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN WILLIAM VAN MOERE | Trustee | 10 March 2001 |
|
|||||||||
IAN MACFARLANE ANDERSON | Trustee | 10 October 1994 |
|
|||||||||
BRIAN MICHAEL HOSIER | Trustee | 13 June 1994 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.66k | £66.04k | £64.35k | £69.62k | £91.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.50k | £75.96k | £70.82k | £75.32k | £105.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND PROPOGATE THE GOSPEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES, PRINCIPLES AND USAGES OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH WITH PARTICULAR RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE THAMES NORTH PROVINCE OF THAT CHURCH. (11)TO ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH WITH PARTICULAR RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE THAMES NORTH PROVINCE OF THAT CHURCH.
Area of benefit
THAMES NORTH PROVINCE OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH - GREATER LONDON NORTH OF THE THAMES, PARTS OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BEDFORDSHIRE, ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls United Reformed Church
Newton Road
London
W2 5LS
- Phone:
- 02077996000
- Email:
- trust@urcthamesnorth.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window