CRAWSHAWBOOTH PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crawshawbooth Pre-School is committed to providing quality care & education for children between the ages of 2 & 5 years. We aim to enhance the development & education of children under statutory school age in a parent involving, community based group.To provide a safe, secure & stimulating environment & to work within a framework which enables quality of opportunity for all children & families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNE ELIZABETH HOLLINGS | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ann Mahood | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.46k | £108.77k | £65.00k | £65.21k | £68.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.77k | £71.51k | £63.48k | £66.12k | £69.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £34.88k | £19.23k | N/A | N/A | £1.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 September 2024 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 September 2024 | 437 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 September 2024 | 802 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 September 2024 | 802 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2022 | 276 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 March 2022 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 March 2022 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VILLAGE CENTRE
ADELAIDE STREET
CRAWSHAWBOOTH
ROSSENDALE
LANCASHIRE
BB4 8PW
- Phone:
- 01706507169
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window