RANGERS FOUNDATION FOR YOUTH AID AND COMMUNITY IN THE ENVIRONMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are mainly an environmental organisation. Over the last few years we have not been operating due to not having a lease on the land and unable to obtain liability insurance. We now have a Lease on the land and are now planning our future activities. We are opening our Community Garden on the 1st April 2013 and this will be accessible for all people. We also have a sports pitch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oldham
Governance
- 11 June 1993: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 January 2013: Re-registered
- RANGERS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SHOLVER RANGERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Holt | Chair | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Ward | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|||||
ROSEMARY JOHNSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £965 | £1.58k | £1.39k | £1.21k | £966 | |
|
Total expenditure | £525 | £780 | £1.08k | £661 | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
I. TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE CONCERNING THE ENVIRONMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES. II. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS. III. TO IMPROVE PROTECT AND PRESERVE ALL FLORA, FAUNA, SCULPTURE AND OTHER STRUCTURES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 TITIAN RISE
OLDHAM
OL1 4PJ
- Phone:
- 01706881806
- Email:
- ROSE.JOHNSTONE@SKY.COM
- Website:
-
no.website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window