Financial history ROSS RUSSELL TRUST

Charity number: 1022570
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £141.77k £126.03k £166.96k £172.87k £170.95k
Total expenditure £375.04k £277.80k £530.28k £209.00k £317.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A