Financial history SOMERSET COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1022578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £158.64k £53.27k £66.59k £47.84k £149.70k
Total expenditure £150.25k £63.02k £88.85k £62.03k £166.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A