SEARS GROUP TRUST

Charity number: 1022586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO AID EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF ANY COMPANY THAT IS OR HAS BEEN ASSOCIATED WITH SEARS LIMITED, AS WELL AS THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS. THE TRUST'S OBJECTIVE IS THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED WHETHER CAUSED BY REASON OF AGE OR SICKNESS OR HOWSOEVER.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £383,146
Total expenditure: £467,096

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Sellars Trustee 17 October 2017
None on record
Christopher Lindsey Huscroft Trustee 11 October 2017
WIGSTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM LIMITED
Received: 5 days late
Margaret Mary Hannell Trustee 28 April 1994
None on record
Sears Group Trustees Limited Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £371.61k £348.18k £309.20k £346.12k £383.15k
Total expenditure £404.34k £402.87k £390.54k £415.72k £467.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Trust Partnership Ltd
6 Trull Farm Buildings
Trull
TETBURY
GL8 8SQ
Phone:
07702520752